ECCLESHALL SHOW SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Running an annual show in the Eccleshall area so as to advance the public's appreciation of agriculture, horticulture, equestrianism and other allied activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Staffordshire
Governance
- 14 June 2010: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Felicity Stubbs | Trustee | 01 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Sheila Elizabeth Kettle | Trustee | 17 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
HAZEL CLARE BRADSHAW | Trustee | 22 June 2011 |
|
|||||
EDWARD PETER REGINALD LAMBERT | Trustee | 22 June 2011 |
|
|
||||
MARY ELIZABETH CARTMAIL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
AMANDA GRAHAM | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £538 | £435 | £48.96k | £47.87k | £53.70k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.84k | £3.84k | £31.58k | £43.63k | £43.96k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 19 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 19 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 20 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 20 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 23 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 23 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 12 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 24 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 31 JANUARY 2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 6 FEBRUARY 2010 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE 11 MAY 2010
Charitable objects
{I) THE ADVANCEMENT OF AGRICULTURE AND HORTICULTURE AND ALLIED INDUSTRIES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF AN ANNUAL SHOW (11) TO FURTHER SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES. AS THE DIRECTORS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
8 Romford Meadow
Eccleshall
STAFFORD
ST21 6SP
- Phone:
- 01785859556
- Email:
- info@eccleshallshow.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window