SCHOOLS LINKING NETWORK
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Charitable objective and mission: The advancement of the education of school children, Developing resources for school staff to use in the classroom, The advancement of equality and diversity and identity.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2014
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England
Governance
- 08 June 2010: Standard registration
- 09 June 2016: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2011 | 31/08/2012 | 31/08/2013 | 31/08/2014 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.70m | £167.17k | £557.81k | £434.09k | |
|
Total expenditure | £935.87k | £754.15k | £396.85k | £463.14k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £0 | N/A | £10 | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £432.88k | N/A | £27.00k | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £1.27m | N/A | £530.04k | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £1.16k | N/A | £662 | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | N/A | £100 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £903.72k | N/A | £388.72k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £9.00k | N/A | £8.13k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2014 | 18 May 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2014 | 18 May 2015 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2013 | 19 February 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2013 | 19 February 2014 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2012 | 05 March 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2012 | 05 March 2013 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 14 AUGUST 2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 1 JULY 2009 AND 25 JUNE 2010 ENTERED ON COMPANIES REGISTER 5 JULY 2010
Charitable objects
3.1 THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION OF SCHOOL CHILDREN, IN PARTICULAR BY: 3.1.1 SUPPORTING AND ENCOURAGING PROJECTS INVOLVING CHILDREN FROM DIFFERENT SOCIAL, ECONOMIC, ETHNICAL AND CULTURAL BACKGROUNDS; 3.1.2 PROVIDING SUPPORT FOR TEACHERS THROUGH ACTION, RESEARCH AND ACCREDITED PROFESSIONAL DEVELOPMENT IN CONJUNCTION WITH OTHER INSTITUTIONS; 3.1.3 DEVELOPING RESOURCES FOR SCHOOL STAFF TO USE IN THE CLASSROOM; 3.1.4 OFFERING GUIDANCE AND SUPPORT FOR SCHOOL LEADERS AND GOVERNORS IN STRENGTHENING THE PROCESS OF EMBEDDING LINKING AND CITIZENSHIP WITHIN SCHOOLS. 3.2 THE ADVANCEMENT OF EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY, IN PARTICULAR BY: 3.2.1 ADVANCING EDUCATION AND RAISING AWARENESS IN EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY; 3.2.2 PROMOTING ACTIVITIES TO FOSTER UNDERSTANDING BETWEEN PEOPLE FROM DIVERSE BACKGROUNDS, IN PARTICULAR BY PROVIDING SUPPORT AND ENCOURAGEMENT FOR SCHOOLS' PARTICIPATION IN PROJECTS WITH OTHER SCHOOLS WITH SIGNIFICANTLY DIFFERENT POPULATIONS AND/OR TO WORK WITHIN [THEIR OWN DIVERSE COMMUNITIES IN ORDER TO ENHANCE THE UNDERSTANDING OF IDENTITY AND DIVERSITY; 3.2.3 CULTIVATING A SENTIMENT IN FAVOUR OF EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY. 3.3 THE ADVANCEMENT OF GOOD CITIZENSHIP IN SCHOOL CHILDREN.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window