Financial history THE GOOD LIFE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1133007
Removed charity

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 15/07/2016 15/07/2017 15/07/2018 15/07/2019 15/07/2020
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A