BEECH TREE BUNNIES
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Leicestershire
Governance
- 09 November 2009: Standard registration
- 09 August 2012: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 28 February 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2011 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 23 FEBRUARY 2009
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING OF ANIMALS IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION AND, IN PARTICULAR, TO PROVIDE AND MAINTAIN RESCUE HOMES OR OTHER FACILITIES FOR THE RECEPTION, CARE AND TREATMENT OF SUCH ANIMALS AND TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN ALL ASPECTS OF ANIMAL CARE AND WELFARE
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window