Accounts and annual returns HOPE HOUSE CHURCH, BARNSLEY

Charity number: 1131876
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 09 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 09 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 26 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 26 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 21 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 21 December 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 17 March 2022 45 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 29 December 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 31 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 31 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window