Financial history HOPE HOUSE CHURCH, BARNSLEY

Charity number: 1131876
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £158.86k £160.99k £149.10k £166.69k £241.11k
Total expenditure £147.98k £139.81k £153.16k £163.30k £188.73k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £16.38k £19.72k £3.39k £16.30k