KIPLING COUNTY CARRIAGE DRIVING GROUP RDA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide facilities for clients/members with disabilities to enjoy and improve their carriage driving skills. Where resources allow, to take clients/members on holiday to enjoy the countryside and experience the feeling of independence.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- East Sussex
Governance
- 16 September 2009: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Karen Leonard | Trustee | 20 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Alison Jane Kennan | Trustee | 27 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susan June O'Dell | Trustee | 15 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Joanne McNicol | Trustee | 15 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Alison Reilly | Trustee | 15 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jeni Longley | Trustee | 15 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Debbie Smith | Trustee | 10 April 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.88k | £3.52k | £9.18k | £8.22k | £8.59k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.64k | £3.29k | £11.91k | £10.57k | £6.39k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 16 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 11 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 22 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 26 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 3 SEPTEMBER 2009
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE OBJECTS OF THE RIDING FOR THE DISABLED ASSOCIATION INCORPORATING CARRIAGE DRIVING A CHARITY REGISTERED UNDER CHARITY NUMBER 244108 ("RDA") BY PROVIDING DISABLED PEOPLE WITH THE OPPORTUNITY TO RIDE AND/OR TO CARRIAGE DRIVE TO BENEFIT THEIR HEALTH AND WELL BEING IN THE EAST SUSSEX AREA.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
11 Collinswood Drive
ST. LEONARDS-ON-SEA
East Sussex
TN38 0NU
- Phone:
- 01424 438180
- Email:
- joloumac69@gmail.com
- Website:
-
kiplingrda.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window