Financial history WORK STRESS SOLUTIONS

Charity number: 1135144
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £16.26k £3.13k £55.34k £5.70k £7.14k
Total expenditure £9.94k £12.33k £30.19k £26.67k £7.64k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £47.74k N/A N/A