WORK STRESS SOLUTIONS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Personal development, coaching and/or training for clients who are vulnerable or experiencing mental or physical health problems who wish to retain or gain employment, education, or voluntary work. Courses in: Mindfulness, Building Confidence, Creative Writing, Self-Employment, IT Skills. Mentoring, talk therapy and referrals to other services if required. Work experience and apprenticeships offer
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Surrey
Governance
- 24 March 2010: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Phillip Haynes | Chair | 24 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Ross Marshall Lee | Trustee | 10 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ashkan Rohani | Trustee | 02 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Raphael Mennicken | Trustee | 02 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Patricia McGuire | Trustee | 31 October 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.26k | £3.13k | £55.34k | £5.70k | £7.14k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.94k | £12.33k | £30.19k | £26.67k | £7.64k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £47.74k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 26 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 26 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 12 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 12 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 26 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 12 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 8 MARCH 2010
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF PERSONS WITH LEARNING DISABILITIES, PHYSICAL DISABILITIES, MENTAL HEALTH NEEDS OR PEOPLE OTHERWISE DISADVANTAGED, VULNERABLE OR SUFFERING FROM SOCIAL EXCLUSION AND FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF SUCH PERSONS
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Brickfield Centre
Portland Place
EPSOM
Surrey
KT17 1DL
- Phone:
- 07759303225
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window