CHIVA AFRICA

Charity number: 1132935
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Chiva Africa objectives are the advancement of education: Of the public and others in the subject of HIV/AIDS and specifically paediatric HIV care in Africa Of HealthCare workers and other treating children with HIV in Africa For any other related purposes which are exclusively charitable.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024

Total income: £33,642
Total expenditure: £32,377

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • South Africa

Governance

Registration history:
  • 24 November 2009: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr KARYN MOSHAL Chair
None on record
Lauren Sandra Jacobson Trustee 05 October 2019
QUARTET OF PEACE TRUST (UK)
Received: On time
Fiona Lindblom Trustee 11 February 2019
ST JOHN'S HOLLAND ROAD TRUST
Received: On time
Shaun Wood Trustee 11 February 2019
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 29/02/2020 28/02/2021 28/02/2022 28/02/2023 29/02/2024
Total gross income £83.29k £44.73k £69.78k £42.41k £33.64k
Total expenditure £107.27k £65.51k £76.84k £15.82k £32.38k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 29 February 2024 18 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2024 18 November 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 28 February 2023 12 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2023 12 December 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 28 February 2022 14 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2022 14 December 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 28 February 2021 23 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2021 23 December 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 29 February 2020 13 January 2021 15 days late
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 13 January 2021 15 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
2ND FLOOR
2 LYTTELTON ROAD
HAMPSTEAD GARDEN SUBURBS
LONDON
N2 0EF
Phone:
02082099100