YOUNG MUSIC MAKERS OF DYFED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To organise an educational programme in the art and craft of music composition. The programme includes workshops, tutorials and a master class/final concert. Workshops are also held for special schools in the area. To advance education in music in particular by holding an annual competitions for young instrumental players up to the age of 19 years and through the provision of public concerts
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
Total income includes £2,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Carmarthenshire
- Ceredigion
- Pembrokeshire
Governance
- 28 September 2009: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Cathy Morris | Trustee | 24 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Madeleine Louise Welch | Trustee | 21 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Conway Morgan | Trustee | 30 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Sharpe | Trustee | 18 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
EMYR WYNNE JONES | Trustee | 29 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
GAYE WILLIAMS | Trustee | 15 December 2011 |
|
|
||||
JANE LEGGETT | Trustee | 14 December 2011 |
|
|||||
PATRICIA NORBURY | Trustee | 14 December 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.73k | £8.24k | £21.57k | £15.21k | £23.48k | |
|
Total expenditure | £24.04k | £6.92k | £16.32k | £22.10k | £21.18k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £2.33k | N/A | N/A | £1.50k | £2.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 23 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 27 June 2024 | 58 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 13 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 05 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 29 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 2 JUNE 2009 as amended on 04 Sep 2018 as amended on 07 Dec 2020
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE MUSIC EDUCATION AND SKILLS OF YOUNG PEOPLE, IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY , IN THE THREE COUNTIES OF DYFED (CARMARTHENSHIRE, CEREDIGION AND PEMBROKESHIRE).
Area of benefit
(CARMARTHENSHIRE, CEREDIGION AND PEMBROKESHIRE).
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 Grange Gardens
LLANTWIT MAJOR
CF61 2XB
- Phone:
- 07977547137
- Email:
- ymmdyfed@gmail.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window