BOSTON AND DISTRICT ATHLETIC CLUB

Charity number: 1133406
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Members compete in 2 track and field leagues, 1 cross country league and sportshall athletics. These include County Championships, Inter Counties, Northern Counties and National Championships. The club has hosted four events, jumps competitions, road races and a six/twelve hour race. Inclusive of all ages and abilities providing good quality coaching and competition opportunities all year round.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £68,055
Total expenditure: £63,204

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Disability
  • Amateur Sport
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Lincolnshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 30 December 2009: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr MARK BOWLER Chair 28 March 2012
None on record
David Johnson Trustee 28 July 2014
None on record
NANETTE JOHNSON Trustee 28 March 2012
None on record
RICHARD ANDERSON Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £41.54k £43.69k £61.81k £67.35k £68.06k
Total expenditure £44.49k £39.00k £61.68k £62.92k £63.20k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £35.00k £24.52k N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 29 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 29 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 01 November 2023 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 01 November 2023 1 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 31 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 31 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 30 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 30 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 28 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 28 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
C/O HON SECRETARY
PADDOCK WAY
FIELD LANE
FRISKNEY
BOSTON
PE22 8RJ
Phone:
01754820623