ASSOCIATION OF ADAPTATION STUDIES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing opportunities for teachers, students and academics to meet and extend the field of adaptation studies Providing opportunities for students and young scholars to participate more fully in these academic debates
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England
Governance
- 22 January 2010: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Professor Monika Maria Pietrzak-Franger | Trustee | 23 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Professor John Harford Williams | Trustee | 23 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Professor Kyle Thomas Meikle | Trustee | 23 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Professor Colleen Bevin Kennedy-Karpat | Trustee | 23 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Professor Anna Mary Blackwell | Trustee | 23 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Professor Christina Wilkins | Trustee | 23 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Professor Eckart Voigts | Trustee | 23 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Professor Thomas Leitch | Trustee | 27 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR DEBORAH JAYNE CARTMELL | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2019 | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.22k | £2.52k | £6.78k | £3.18k | £4.26k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.58k | £2.37k | £10.63k | £9.57k | £5.10k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 17 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 29 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 29 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 26 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2019 | 20 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 25 SEPTEMBER 2008 AS AMENDED 15 DECEMBER 2009
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN ADAPTATION STUDIES, BEING THE STUDY OF THE ADAPTATION OF LITERATURE TO FILM, FILM TO LITERATURE AND TRANSMEDIA ADAPTATIONS ACROSS DIFFERENT DISCIPLINES AND EDUCATIONAL SECTORS.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONALLY AND OVERSEAS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Centre for Adaptation Studies
De Montfort University
The Gateway
Leicester
LE1 9BH
- Phone:
- 0116 255 1551
- Email:
- djc@dmu.ac.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window