ADVOCACY FOR NEUROACANTHOCYTOSIS PATIENTS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Through personal contact and a news letter the Advocacy supports patients with neuroacanthocytosis and their families around the world. We are also an important initiator and financial supporter of education including research into the clinical and basic science of these neurodegenerative diseases.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Oxfordshire
- France
- Germany
- Italy
- Japan
- Netherlands
- Portugal
- Spain
- Switzerland
- United States
Governance
- 08 December 2009: Standard registration
- N A FUND (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GINGER IRVINE | Chair |
|
||||||
Nicola Keat | Trustee | 01 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mary Elizabeth Leigh-Wood | Trustee | 04 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Peter George Mills | Trustee | 04 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Neil Price | Trustee | 25 May 2016 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £183.09k | £182.14k | £15.08k | £90.10k | £8.85k | |
|
Total expenditure | £87.22k | £100.25k | £89.20k | £16.79k | £33.94k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 04 July 2024 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 29 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 29 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 07 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 18 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 18 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 29 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 29 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 25 AUGUST 2009
Charitable objects
1 TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH OF SUFFERERS OF NEUROACANTHOCYTOSIS DISEASES AND THEIR FAMILIES THROUGH THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT, EDUCATION AND PRACTICAL ADVICE 2 TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF HEALTH PROFESSIONALS AND THE GENERAL PUBLIC IN AL AREAS RELATING TO NEUROACANTHOCYTOSIS DISEASES
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 39
Coleherne Court
The Little Boltons
LONDON
SW5 0DN
- Phone:
- 02074608874
- Email:
- ginger@naadvocacy.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window