THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIATICAL PARISH OF ALL SAINTS PECKHAM

Charity Number: 1131846
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Key emphases of the charity are to have radical unity in our vibrant community, seek God's wholeness for the broken, celebrate younger generations as the Church of today and to go, wherever God leads, to make disciples. This is achieved by encountering Father, Son and Holy Spirit in Word and worship, growing as disciples together and experiencing the Spirit's transforming power in prayer.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Southwark

Governance

Registration history:
  • 25 September 2009: Previously excepted registration
  • 17 June 2024: Funds received from 1138684 CITY LIFE LONDON
Organisation type:
Previously excepted
Other names:
  • THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIATICAL PARISH OF ALL SAINTS CAMBERWELL (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

15 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Christopher David Sewell Trustee 09 May 2024
None on record
Kathryn Beatham Trustee 09 May 2024
None on record
Marie-Louise Samuels Trustee 09 May 2024
None on record
Jennifer Griffin-Walters Trustee 24 May 2023
None on record
Joshua Pedro Trustee 24 May 2023
None on record
Rev Gregory Cushing Trustee 25 April 2023
None on record
Hermione Lawrence Trustee 27 April 2022
None on record
Antony Madu Trustee 27 April 2022
None on record
Paul David West Trustee 27 April 2022
None on record
Elizabeth Helen Fothergill Trustee 12 May 2021
None on record
Raphael Olumuyiwa Pedro Trustee 22 October 2020
None on record
Olivia Ely Brambill Trustee 24 April 2019
None on record
Dr JANE ANNE FRYER Trustee 25 April 2015
None on record
ROGER MARTIN ORR Trustee 28 July 2011
THE COMMUNITY OF CELEBRATION CHRISTIAN TRUST
Received: On time
THE TISBURY TELEGRAPH TRUST
Received: On time
ELEANOR MARY ORR Trustee
CHRISTIAN ECOLOGY LINK
Received: On time
THE TISBURY TELEGRAPH TRUST
Received: On time
GROWING HOPE BROCKLEY
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £633.84k £581.50k £549.40k £428.19k £505.28k
Total expenditure £659.49k £607.14k £639.63k £484.04k £529.12k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £19.56k £8.20k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £583.08k £567.04k £516.20k N/A £430.63k
Income - Other trading activities £7.87k £11.87k £0 N/A £47.23k
Income - Charitable activities £42.50k £2.43k £2.35k N/A £26.63k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 N/A £0
Income - Investment £363 £148 £12 N/A £788
Income - Other £20 £0 £30.84k N/A £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £659.49k £607.14k £639.63k N/A £529.12k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 £4.26k £0 N/A £4.62k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £57.28k £0 N/A £47.78k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 N/A £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Own use assets £410.94k £396.89k £401.14k N/A £372.87k
Long-term investments £0 £0 £0 N/A £0
Other assets £229.41k £224.86k £127.71k N/A £86.85k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 N/A £0
Total liabilities £3.90k £10.95k £8.28k N/A £18.66k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 04 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 04 July 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 02 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 02 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 31 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 31 August 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 15 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 15 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 30 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 30 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
ALL SAINTS PECKHAM
BLENHEIM GROVE
LONDON
SE15 4QS
Phone:
02036372701