THE BEES FOOTBALL FOUNDATION LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Belmont United Youth Football Club, provides sporting facilities, training and coaching sessions run by a team of FA accredited volunteers, sourced within the local community. Our goal is to provide a fun, safe environment for children to learn, grow and develop, on and off the field.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Harrow
Governance
- 15 February 2010: Standard registration
- BELMONT YFC LIMITED (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Paul Reece | Trustee | 12 October 2021 |
|
|||||
Anthony Kleanthous | Trustee | 12 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Graham Slyper | Trustee | 12 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Natasha Kleanthous | Trustee | 12 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Martin | Trustee | 09 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
PANAYI GEORGIOU | Trustee | 26 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Panayi Georgiou | Trustee | 26 August 2020 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.10k | £525 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.01k | £8.39k | £84 | £84 | £84 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 20 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 17 April 2024 | 17 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 13 April 2023 | 13 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 06 September 2022 | 159 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 25 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 19 NOVEMBER 2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 14 DECEMBER 2009 as amended on 30 Jan 2023
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF MIDDLESEX BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR PLAYING FOOTBALL.
Area of benefit
MIDDLESEX
Contact information
- Address:
-
Belmont United Youth FC
The Hive London
Camrose Avenue
EDGWARE
Middlesex
HA8 6AG
- Phone:
- 02083813800
- Email:
- mpatel@tichealth.co.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window