Financial history THE REPTON VILLAGE HALL COMPANY

Charity number: 1131731
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £473.78k £48.32k £133.07k £80.00k £99.93k
Total expenditure £17.47k £41.57k £32.39k £72.01k £90.37k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £436.33k N/A £17.68k £2.67k £22.52k