RIVERSIDE CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the Christian faith, to relieve sickness and financial hardship, to provide community facilites for recreational and other use in the interests of social welfare for persons who have needs.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
160 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Kent
Governance
- 28 September 2009: Previously excepted registration
- TANKERTON EVANGELICAL CHURCH (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kirsteen Magee | Chair | 17 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Julia Swansbury | Trustee | 29 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sean Carter | Trustee | 17 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
DARLENE BUSHELL | Trustee | 26 June 2018 |
|
|||||
SIMON BATESON | Trustee | 17 November 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £401.49k | £535.57k | £537.29k | £654.77k | £447.29k | |
|
Total expenditure | £452.81k | £576.27k | £485.13k | £627.48k | £545.73k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £1.30k | N/A | £5.12k | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | £339.26k | £335.35k | £264.35k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | £72.31k | £43.20k | £99.35k | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | £69.86k | £46.98k | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | £54.14k | £16.76k | £49.98k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | £0 | £95.00k | £241.09k | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | £0 | £100.00k | £14.69k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | £553.74k | £469.79k | £595.19k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | £22.53k | £15.33k | £32.29k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | £1.40k | £1.43k | £1.95k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | £0 | £0 | £17.15k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 26 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 26 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 16 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 16 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 29 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 29 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 11 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 11 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 08 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 08 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 06/08/2009 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 11/02/2015
Charitable objects
(A) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS APPEARING IN THE SCHEDULE HERETO IN TANKERTON, WHITSTABLE KENT AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT AND TO FULFIL SUCH OTHER PURPOSES WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AND ARE CONNECTED WITH THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE CHARITY; (B) TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AND TO PROMOTE AND PRESERVE GOOD HEALTH BY THE PROVISION OF FUNDS, GOODS OR SERVICES OF ANY KIND, INCLUDING THROUGH THE PROVISION OF COUNSELLING AND SUPPORT IN TANKERTON KENT AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT. (C) TO PROVIDE COMMUNITY FACILITIES FOR RECREATIONAL AND OTHER LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR PERSONS WHO HAVE NEED BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE IN TANKERTON KENT AFORESAID AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
TANKERTON, WHITSTABLE KENT
Contact information
- Address:
-
Riverside Church
Riverside Works
Thanet Way
Chestfield
WHITSTABLE
CT5 3JQ
- Phone:
- 01227250240
- Email:
- info@riversideuk.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window