THE INTERNATIONAL CML FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The advancement of health by the improvement of the treatment in all parts of the world of chronic myeloid leukaemia and related diseases.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2022
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£80k to £90k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Armenia
- Australia
- Belarus
- Botswana
- Brazil
- China
- Ethiopia
- Georgia
- Ghana
- India
- Indonesia
- Kenya
- Kyrgyzstan
- Macedonia
- Nepal
- Niger
- Nigeria
- Pakistan
- Papua New Guinea
- Paraguay
- Philippines
- Senegal
- Togo
- Ukraine
- United States
- Uruguay
Governance
- 26 November 2009: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr TIMOTHY PETER HUGHES | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Michael Mauro | Trustee | 01 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Giuseppe Saglio | Trustee | 01 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR JANE FELICITY APPERLEY | Trustee | 19 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
Dr Charles Schiffer | Trustee | 26 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
Dr BRIAN DRUKER | Trustee | 16 March 2012 |
|
|
||||
Dr JERALD RADICH | Trustee | 16 March 2012 |
|
|
||||
Dr ANDREAS HOCHHAUS | Trustee | 16 March 2012 |
|
|
||||
Dr EDUARDO CORTES | Trustee | 16 March 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2018 | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £403.34k | £378.31k | £200.37k | £69.20k | £209.23k | |
|
Total expenditure | £323.78k | £323.89k | £227.29k | £146.66k | £186.04k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 333 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 333 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 22 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 22 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 27 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 27 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 29 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 29 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 30 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 30 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 20 AUGUST 2009
Charitable objects
3.1. THE GENERAL CHARITABLE OBJECTS FOR WHICH THE FOUNDATION IS ESTABLISHED ARE THE ADVANCEMENT OF HEALTH BY THE IMPROVEMENT OF THE TREATMENT IN ALL PARTS OF THE WORLD OF CHRONIC MYELOID LEUKAEMIA AND RELATED DISEASES (TOGETHER "CML") AND FOR THE PURPOSE OF CARRYING OUT THOSE GENERAL OBJECTS THE PRIMARY OBJECTS OF THE FOUNDATION ARE IN PARTICULAR:- 3.1.1. TO IMPROVE CLINICAL PRACTICE AND DISEASE MONITORING IN THE TREATMENT OF CML 3.1.2. TO SUPPORT ENCOURAGE AND PROMOTE RESEARCH INTO THE CAUSES, PREVENTION, STUDY AND TREATMENT OF CML 3.1.3. TO PROMOTE AND SUPPORT THE EDUCATION OF AND DISSEMINATE KNOWLEDGE AMONGST CLINICIANS, SCIENTISTS, HEALTH PROFESSIONALS AND PATIENTS IN MATTERS CONCERNING CML 3.1.4. TO PROMOTE, FOSTER AND CO-ORDINATE COLLABORATION THAT IS PARTICULARLY (BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY) INTERNATIONAL AND IS NOT ONLY IN THE AREAS AND ACTIVITIES OF CLINICAL PRACTICE DISEASE MONITORING AND RESEARCH INTO CML BUT ALSO IN ANY AREA OR ACTIVITY WHICH IS OR MAY BE CONDUCIVE TO THE ACCELERATION OF THE CONTROL AND/OR CURE OF CML 3.1.5. TO PROMOTE SET UP ESTABLISH AND SUPPORT AND SHARE AND EXCHANGE KNOWLEDGE WITH OTHER ORGANISATIONS WHOSE OBJECTS ARE SIMILAR TO THESE GENERAL OR PRIMARY OBJECTS 3.1.6. TO ASSIST OR PROMOTE ANY OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES WHICH ARE RELATED TO THESE GENERAL AND PRIMARY OBJECTS
Area of benefit
THE WORLD
Contact information
- Address:
-
6 South Terrace
Kensington Gardens
Australia
- Phone:
- 01424210530
- Email:
- info@cml-foundation.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window