REACH CHARITY LIMITED

Charity number: 1134544
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Reach provides support and information for families who have children with upper limb deficiency. They organise local and national events so that families can meet and support each other. We operate a Bursary Grant scheme to make grants to individuals with skeletal upper limb defects where there is a proven need.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Disability
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales
  • Ireland
  • Isle Of Man
  • Northern Ireland
  • Scotland

Governance

Registration history:
  • 26 February 2010: Standard registration
  • 18 August 2011: Funds received from 278679 REACH - THE ASSOCIATION FOR CHILDREN WITH HAND OR ...
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Christopher Creamer Chair 22 October 2022
None on record
Colm Gearoid Creamer Trustee 07 September 2024
None on record
Rebecca Claire Nind Trustee 22 June 2024
None on record
Ella Dickenson Trustee 22 June 2024
None on record
Steven Haynes Trustee 21 October 2023
None on record
Phillip Robertson Trustee 28 January 2023
THE HEDGEHOGS
Received: On time
Esther Pounder Trustee 22 October 2022
None on record
Gary Phillips Trustee 22 October 2022
None on record
Emily Jayne Tisshaw Trustee 22 October 2022
None on record
Lee Harvey Trustee 22 October 2022
None on record
Ruth Lester Trustee 22 October 2016
None on record
JULIE DETHERIDGE Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 29/02/2020 28/02/2021 28/02/2022 28/02/2023 29/02/2024
Total gross income £242.59k £252.73k £170.60k £200.02k £727.79k
Total expenditure £270.22k £168.02k £179.67k £176.08k £347.22k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £669.49k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £31.75k
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £24.12k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A N/A £2.43k
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £550.37k
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £334.67k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A £12.56k
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A N/A £17.01k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 29/02/2020 28/02/2021 28/02/2022 28/02/2023 29/02/2024
Own use assets N/A N/A N/A N/A £15.44k
Long-term investments N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Other assets N/A N/A N/A N/A £616.79k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Total liabilities N/A N/A N/A N/A £13.59k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 29 February 2024 26 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2024 26 November 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 28 February 2023 28 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2023 28 December 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 28 February 2022 22 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2022 22 December 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 28 February 2021 20 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2021 20 December 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 29 February 2020 12 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 10 November 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Office Number 4 The Library Rooms
First Floor
59 High Street
TOTNES
Devon
TQ9 5PB
Phone:
0300 365 0078