Financial history HERTFORD AND HITCHIN AREA MEETING OF THE RELIGIOUS SOCIETY OF FRIENDS (QUAKERS)

Charity number: 1131894
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £162.48k £165.45k £165.45k £300.88k £214.75k
Total expenditure £173.62k £140.94k £140.94k £195.86k £166.58k
Income from government contracts £3.00k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £2.19k £6.20k £3.90k N/A