Trustees HERTFORD AND HITCHIN AREA MEETING OF THE RELIGIOUS SOCIETY OF FRIENDS (QUAKERS)
Charity number: 1131894

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mary Lai Peng Brown | Trustee | 18 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas John Needham | Trustee | 19 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Philip Rowe | Trustee | 20 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Clare Elizabeth Cooper | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
David Hindle | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.