ABENE KARANTAA LIMITED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Development work in 3 villages in Senegal
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2012
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Senegal
- The Gambia
Governance
- 01 December 2009: Standard registration
- 26 March 2013: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.33k | £2.21k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.06k | £396 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | 12 July 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | 12 July 2012 | 163 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 11 AUGUST 2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 9 NOVEMBER 2009
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION, RELIEVE UNEMPLOYMENT AND PROMOTE GOOD HEALTH IN WEST AFRICA WITH A VIEW TO DEVELOPING PEOPLE'S CAPACITIES AND CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Area of benefit
WEST AFRICA
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window