VALE OF EVESHAM COMMUNITY FIRST RESPONDERS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We respond to emergency calls when called upon by the West Midlands Ambulance Service. We also work to increase awareness, availability and the use of life saving resources within our local communities. We will use our assets in the best possible way, for the benefit of the local communities we serve.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Gloucestershire
- Warwickshire
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 05 November 2009: Standard registration
- VOECFR.ORG (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANTHONY JOHN HAINES | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Robin Adrian Farnworth | Trustee | 05 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET PATRICIA HOSKINS | Trustee | 13 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
SALLY MARIE WARREN | Trustee | 05 January 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £287 | £249 | £677 | £3.17k | £16 | |
|
Total expenditure | £198 | £216 | £2.77k | £1.93k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 25 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 01 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 09 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 12 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 15 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 17 SEPTEMBER 2009
Charitable objects
TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE HEALTH OF PATIENTS OF THE WEST MIDLANDS AMBULANCE SERVICE (WMAS) IN THE BROADWAY, EVESHAM, AND PERSHORE AREAS BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF EMERGENCY MEDICAL CARE DURING 999 CALLS TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE HEALTH OF THE PATIENTS OF WMAS IN THE BROADWAY, EVESHAM AND PERSHORE AREAS BY ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF EQUIPMENT , FACILITIES AND SERVICES TO COMMUNITY FIRST RESPONDERS IN THE AREA, WHERE THIS EQUIPMENT, FACILITIES AND SERVICES ARE NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE STATUTORY AUTHORITIES.
Area of benefit
THE BROADWAY, EVESHAM,AND PERSHORE
Contact information
- Address:
-
33 PENSHAM
PERSHORE
WR10 3HB
- Phone:
- 01386554417
- Email:
- info@voecfr.org.uk
- Website:
-
voecfr.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window