Financial history SYEDA ZAINAB TRUST

Charity number: 1135836
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £35.00k £85.02k £101.50k £89.38k £106.18k
Total expenditure £27.96k £79.95k £45.48k £66.58k £126.27k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A