PHILADELPHIA WESLEYAN REFORM CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We hold two religious services each Sunday, to which all are welcome, any age, disabled. We run a weekly mother and toddler group. We hold a fortnightly midweek act of worship and a fortnightly 'home produce' sale with refreshments - both these events for any age and any ethnic group. Coffee mornings are held on a Saturday. All the above are advertised on the church noticeboard.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Sheffield City
Governance
- 03 March 2010: Standard registration
No other names
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MISS D .MANN | Chair |
|
|
|||||
JONATHAN BEN YOUDAN | Trustee | 07 November 2012 |
|
|||||
MRS R. HOLMES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR E. HODSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MISS J. SENIOR | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.45k | £5.08k | £5.09k | £6.04k | £5.82k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.37k | £4.34k | £3.45k | £4.90k | £5.39k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 27 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 September 2024 | 332 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 26 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 02 February 2022 | 94 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 26 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
REFERENCE DEED DATED 23 FEBRUARY 1965
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES FOR THE TIME BEING SHALL AT ALL TIMES PERMIT THE SAID PREMISES AND THE CHAPEL SCHOOL OR OTHER BUILDINGS FROM TIME TO TIME STANDING THEREON TO BE USED AND OCCUPIED AND ENJOYED AS A PLACE FOR THE PUBLIC WORSHIP OF GOD AND FOR THE INSTRUCTION OF CHILDREN AND ADULTS UNDER THE DIRECTION OF THE SOCIETY OR CHURCH ASSEMBLING FOR WORSHIP THEREON IN CONNECTION WITH THE SAID DENOMINATION OR CONNEXION ACCORDING TO THE PRINCIPLES CONSTITUTION USAGES POLITY AND RULES FROM TIME TO TIME OF THE SAID DENOMINATION AND ALSO FOR THE PROMOTION OF SUCH OTHER RELIGIOUS, EDUCATIONAL OR CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE SAID SOCIETY OR CHURCH SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DIRECT.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Philadelphia Wesleyan Reform Church
Upperthorpe Road
Sheffield
S6 3EA
- Phone:
- 01142863435
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window