MINERVA (NORTHUMBERLAND) LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
?Our Mission is to help those with different learning abilities to realise their full potential as individuals by providing craft, design, & general art training. We aspire to develop individual strengths and build on self-esteem and self confidence through the courses and practical work experience we offer.?
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Northumberland
Governance
- 03 February 2010: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Martin Stuart Brunskill | Trustee | 02 February 2024 |
|
|||||
Agnieszka Rudnik | Trustee | 11 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stine Jaer Steward | Trustee | 01 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
JAMES MAUGHAN-MILLIGAN | Trustee | 08 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
FRANK CELINO | Trustee | 24 February 2012 |
|
|
||||
Jane Wrighton | Trustee | 15 August 2000 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2019 | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £28.03k | £38.62k | £38.07k | £41.23k | £57.91k | |
|
Total expenditure | £34.05k | £38.25k | £36.20k | £44.23k | £59.28k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £12.00k | £2.10k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 30 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | 30 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 26 January 2024 | 118 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | 26 January 2024 | 118 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 13 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | 13 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 29 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | 29 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2019 | 01 October 2020 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2019 | 01 October 2020 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 7 DECEMBER 2009
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION, TRAINING AND SKILLS OF PEOPLE WHO HAVE A DISABILITY, BY THE PROVISION OF TRAINING, COUNSELLING AND OTHER RELEVANT SUPPORT SERVICES.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
17
HALLSTILE BANK
HEXHAM
- Phone:
- 01434608222
- Email:
- contact@minerva-centre.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window