CORNERSTONE CHURCH NEWCASTLE LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Christian Church
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
60 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£70k to £80k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Newcastle Upon Tyne City
Governance
- 06 October 2009: Standard registration
- CALVARY COMMUNITY CHURCH LIMITED (Previous name)
- THE HOUSE NEWCASTLE LIMITED (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
James Grant Henderson | Chair | 19 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Vikki Pestell | Trustee | 26 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Oxley | Trustee | 26 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michael John Nicholson | Trustee | 19 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
JOEL MARSDEN | Trustee | 29 June 2012 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL DUFF | Trustee | 29 June 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £152.51k | £193.31k | £215.97k | £422.13k | £190.27k | |
|
Total expenditure | £136.18k | £114.92k | £138.61k | £207.38k | £258.34k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 26/06/2009 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 18/05/2010 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 11/09/2013
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ("THE OBJECTS") ARE THE ADVANCEMENT OF CHRISTIANITY FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE FOLLOWING: A. TO WORSHIP GOD THE FATHER, SON AND HOLY SPIRIT; B. TO BUILD UP THE CHURCH OF JESUS CHRIST, IN PARTICULAR THROUGH THE TEACHING AND PREACHING OF THE WORD OF GOD (THE BIBLE); C. TO PROCLAIM THAT MEN AND WOMEN SHOULD REPENT AND BELIEVE IN JESUS CHRIST AS SAVIOUR AND LORD; D. AS WE HAVE OPPORTUNITY, TO DO GOOD TO ALL, ESPECIALLY TO THOSE WHO ARE OF THE HOUSEHOLD OF FAITH (GALATIANS 6:10).
Area of benefit
INDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Cornerstone Church Newcastle
Central Hall
Maple Terrace
NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE
NE4 7SF
- Phone:
- 07447012102
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window