Financial history TRIRATNA BUDDHIST COMMUNITY (LEEDS)

Charity Number: 1132691
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/07/2020 30/07/2021 30/07/2022 30/07/2023 30/07/2024
Total gross income £34.65k £23.00k £43.92k £89.81k £49.10k
Total expenditure £44.37k £13.16k £13.00k £58.75k £30.63k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A