HIGHAMS PARK COUNSELLING

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide counselling, support and help at the moment of crisis or concern, this can be done through self referral or GP referral. There is a team who offer a range of specialist advice adhering to BACP guidelines available seven days a week. We also work in family and work mediation, which is something that is causing concern on a frequent basis.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Waltham Forest
Governance
- 02 September 2010: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PETER MUMFORD | Chair | 26 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
DR K JOHNSON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | 30/11/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £49.79k | £62.36k | £74.72k | £84.68k | £38.20k | |
|
Total expenditure | £50.95k | £62.80k | £78.33k | £78.66k | £39.54k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2024 | 13 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2024 | 13 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 01 October 2024 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | 01 October 2024 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 09 October 2023 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | 09 October 2023 | 9 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 12 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | 12 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 31 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | 31 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 6 NOVEMBER 2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 7 JULY 2010 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE 21 JULY 2010
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS AND THE PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF GOOD HEALTH THROUGHOUT WALTHAM FOREST AND SURROUNDING AREAS.
Area of benefit
WALTHAM FOREST
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 THE AVENUE
LONDON
E4 9LD
- Phone:
- 02085315115
- Email:
- h.p.c.c@hotmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window