Financial history HILLINGDON STREET ANGELS

Charity Number: 1140000
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £2.36k £1.72k £1.72k £320 £120
Total expenditure £1.60k £1.16k £355 £357 £173
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A