COLTS TO AFRICA LEVEL FIELDS
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Volunteer trips to zambia and kenya to aid youth football development
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 October 2018
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Cambridgeshire
- Nottingham City
- Nottinghamshire
- Kenya
- Zambia
Governance
- 25 November 2009: Standard registration
- 15 February 2020: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- COLTS TO AFRICA (Previous name)
- NETHERFIELD COLTS TO AFRICA (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/10/2014 | 01/10/2015 | 01/10/2016 | 01/10/2017 | 01/10/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £224 | £525 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £2.37k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 October 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 01 October 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 01 October 2018 | 27 January 2020 | 179 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 October 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 October 2017 | 23 April 2019 | 265 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 October 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 October 2016 | 03 August 2017 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 October 2016 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 01/10/2009 AS AMENDED ON 14/09/2011 AS AMENDED ON 01/09/2013
Charitable objects
THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY IN AFRICA BY PROVIDING: GRANTS, ITEMS AND SERVICES TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED AND/OR CHARITIES, OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY. TO ADVANCE IN LIFE AND RELIEVE NEEDS OF YOUNG PEOPLE THROUGH: A) THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES PROVIDED IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE DESIGNED TO IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE B) PROVIDING SUPPORT AND ACTIVITIES WHICH DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS.
Area of benefit
AFRICA
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window