THE HASTINGS AND ROTHER RAINBOW ALLIANCE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Supporting the Lesbian, gay, Bisexual and Trans (LGBT) communities in Hastings and Rother.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- East Sussex
Governance
- 04 February 2010: Standard registration
- HASTINGS AND ROTHER RAINBOW ALLIANCE (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Isabelle Thornton | Trustee | 16 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Andrew Ian Barton | Trustee | 01 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Chrissy Brand | Trustee | 27 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Ben Sallows | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.22k | £434 | £887 | £6.50k | £2.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.47k | £794 | £2.65k | £4.26k | £2.44k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 27 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 27 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 22 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 22 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 17 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 22/05/2009 AS AMENDED ON 13/01/2010 AS AMENDED ON 07/10/2011 AS AMENDED ON 09/11/2012
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS (THE OBJECTS), BEING PRIMARILY ADVANCED IN HASTINGS AND ROTHER, ARE: 3.1) THE PROMOTION OF EQUALITY OF TREATMENT AND DIVERSITY PARTICULARLY IN RELATION TO LESBIAN, GAY, BISEXUAL AND TRANSGENDER PERSONS FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY: A) THE ELIMINATION OF DISCRIMINATION ON THE GROUNDS OF GENDER OR SEXUAL ORIENTATION; B) ADVANCING EDUCATION AND RAISING AWARENESS IN EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY; C) PROMOTING ACTIVITIES TO FOSTER UNDERSTANDING BETWEEN PEOPLE FROM DIVERSE BACKGROUNDS D) CULTIVATING A SENTIMENT IN FAVOUR OF EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY 3.2) TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF LESBIAN, GAY, BISEXUAL AND TRANSGENDER PERSONS IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: A) OFFERING INFORMATION AND SUPPORT B) ACTING AS AN ADVOCATE FOR THE NEEDS OF SUCH PERSONS WITHIN DECISION MAKING BODIES C) PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Area of benefit
HASTINGS AND ROTHER,
Contact information
- Address:
-
Hastings and Rother Rainbow Alliance
Jackson Hall
Portland Place
Hastings
TN34 1QN
- Phone:
- 00
- Email:
- info@hrra.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window