THE PHOENIX RESOURCE CENTRE (NORTHAMPTON) LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF THE ENVIRONMENT FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY THE PROMOTION OF WASTE REDUCTION, RE-USE RECLAMATION, RECYCLING, USE OF RECYCLED PRODUCTS AND THE USE OF SURPLUS.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 28 February 2023
Total income includes £5,600 from 1 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
1040 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England
- Djibouti
- Ghana
- Somalia
Governance
- 11 January 2010: Standard registration
- THE PHOENIX RESOURCE CENTRE (Previous name)
- THE PHOENIX RESOURCE CENTRE (NORTHAMPTON) (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOHN WALTER RICHARDSON | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Bayo Alaba | Trustee | 01 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
MR ANDY RICHARDSON | Trustee |
|
||||||
MARGARET ANN RICHARDSON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 28/02/2019 | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £163.57k | £135.27k | £214.13k | £214.56k | £196.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £148.89k | £113.10k | £213.41k | £205.29k | £199.84k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £77.00k | £68.32k | £5.60k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 139 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 139 days | |
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 27 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | 27 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 21 March 2023 | 83 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | 21 March 2023 | 83 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 31 March 2022 | 93 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | 31 March 2022 | 93 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 26 March 2021 | 87 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | 26 March 2021 | 87 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 24 SEPTEMBER 2009
Charitable objects
THE PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF THE ENVIRONMENT FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY THE PROMOTION OF WASTE REDUCTION, RE-USE RECLAMATION, RECYCLING, USE OF RECYCLED PRODUCTS AND THE USE OF SURPLUS.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL .
Contact information
- Address:
-
Unit 10 - 11
Bevan Close
Finedon Road Industrial Estate
WELLINGBOROUGH
Northamptonshire
NN8 4BL
- Phone:
- 07415104440
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window