IRON AID FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1134493
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

1) To advance the education of the Muslim community by such means as deemed charitable at law. 2) To advance and promote the relief of poverty 3) The relief of sickness and the preservation of good health among the Muslim community. 4) To promote social inclusion for the public benefit by preventing people from becoming socially excluded,

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Religious Activities
  • Amateur Sport
  • Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
Who the charity helps:
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England

Governance

Registration history:
  • 24 February 2010: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Tariq Zaman Chair
HASHIM WELFARE HOSPITAL APPEAL
Received: On time
Sohail Anjum Syed Trustee 16 October 2021
None on record
MOHAMMAD SHOAIB OOSMAN Trustee
None on record
MOHAMED AMEEN KALLA Trustee
None on record
LIAQUAT KHAN Trustee
None on record
TARIK CHOWDHRY Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2020 31/01/2021 31/01/2022 31/01/2023 31/01/2024
Total gross income £331.25k £49.77k £2.07m £152.66k £1.05m
Total expenditure £62.42k £12.64k £185.75k £74.80k £100.11k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A £2.07m N/A £1.05m
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A £0 N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A £0 N/A £0
Income - Endowments N/A N/A £0 N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A £0 N/A £0
Income - Other N/A N/A £0 N/A £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A £85.18k N/A £39.05k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A £100.57k N/A £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A £3.60k N/A £0
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A £0 N/A £61.07k

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/01/2020 31/01/2021 31/01/2022 31/01/2023 31/01/2024
Own use assets N/A N/A £0 N/A £3.95m
Long-term investments N/A N/A £2.36m N/A £0
Other assets N/A N/A £408.14k N/A £553.63k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability N/A N/A £0 N/A £0
Total liabilities N/A N/A £256.41k N/A £1.21m

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2024 30 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2024 30 November 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 January 2023 31 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2023 31 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 January 2022 01 January 2023 32 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2022 01 January 2023 32 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 January 2021 23 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2021 23 November 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 January 2020 31 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2020 31 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
NORTHWOOD HILLS MASJID CC
JOEL STREET
NORTHWOOD
HA6 1NL
Phone:
01923213313