Financial history CHANGING LIVES HOUSING TRUST

Charity number: 1134768
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £3.06m £3.42m £3.80m £4.35m £4.53m
Total expenditure £2.73m £3.30m £3.75m £4.23m £4.53m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £28.51k £0 £32.59k £82.28k
Income - Charitable activities £3.02m £3.36m £3.78m £4.29m £4.41m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £2.34k £20 £6 £54 £5
Income - Other £34.58k £32.23k £24.71k £24.22k £38.05k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.73m £3.30m £3.75m £3.49m £4.53m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £6.50k £0 £7.50k £7.75k £7.75k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £27.65k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £5.12k £0 £0 £745.45k £0