Financial history BOLTON HOOVER BRASS BAND

Charity number: 1133229
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £24.92k £8.92k £8.13k £8.72k £9.58k
Total expenditure £19.17k £5.16k £8.14k £8.92k £11.81k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A