DEERHURST COMMUNITY PRESERVATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Monitoring the operation of the flood defences and pumping station protecting the Village of Deerhurst from fluvial flooding from the River Severn and pluvial flooding generally. Liaiseing with the Environment Agency, Gloucestershire County Council and Tewkesbury Borough Council to ensure the defences are fit for purpose and seeking improvements to them .
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Gloucestershire
Governance
- 11 January 2010: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew Philip Leeke | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Adam Sherwin Bridge | Trustee | 25 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Norman Stuart Macpherson | Trustee | 05 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
BRIAN HERBERT LEEKE | Trustee |
|
||||||
GEORGE WILLIAM MORRIS | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.95k | £1.25k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £78 | £501 | £0 | £376 | £300 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 30 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 31 July 2023 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 14 March 2023 | 227 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 28 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 07 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 24 SEPTEMBER 2009.
Charitable objects
TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE PERSONS AND PROPERTY OF THE RESIDENTS OF THE VILLAGE OF DEERHURST, GLOUCESTERSHIRE AS A COMMUNITY FROM PLUVIAL AND FLUVIAL FLOODING GENERALLY AND IN PARTICULAR FROM THE RIVER SEVERN.
Area of benefit
DEERHURST, GLOUCESTERSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
DEERHURST HOUSE
DEERHURST
GLOUCESTER
GL19 4BX
- Phone:
- 07974 640191
- Email:
- andrew.leeke@woflaw.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window