Financial history DORKING UNITED REFORMED CHURCH CHARITY

Charity number: 1132113
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £295.92k £125.41k £193.00k £150.31k £386.45k
Total expenditure £295.65k £149.22k £171.50k £223.50k £242.70k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £5.11k N/A N/A £16.25k