VITAL VOICES EUROPE LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity advances the human rights of women, raises awareness of issues such as human trafficking and promotes public support for human rights. It has organised meetings between key stakeholders in this area including government ministers, NGOs and international supporters of Vital Voices, through which participants can develop initiatives and ideas and support and learn from each others work.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England
- Ireland
- Spain
- Switzerland
Governance
- 21 April 2010: Standard registration
- VITAL VOICES (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sagrario Isabel Maceira Villaverde | Chair | 01 July 2014 |
|
|
||||
Rory Tobin | Trustee | 09 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Silje Christine Auguston | Trustee | 21 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Mary Taylor | Trustee | 12 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Alyse Colleen Nelson | Trustee | 25 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
Susan Ann Davis | Trustee | 01 July 2014 |
|
|
||||
Aleksandra Gren | Trustee | 01 July 2014 |
|
|
||||
Norah Colette Casey | Trustee | 01 July 2014 |
|
|
||||
Kay Ellen Consolver | Trustee | 01 July 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £30.10k | £52.32k | £0 | £12.50k | £16.38k | |
|
Total expenditure | £51.09k | £35.83k | £3.47k | £14.10k | £13.06k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 10 September 2024 | 42 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 05 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 22 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 11 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 11 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 27 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 27 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 29/09/2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 01/03/2010 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 30/11/2015
Charitable objects
1 THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF WOMEN WORLDWIDE, PARTICULARLY IN, BUT NOT LIMITED TO, THE SUBJECTS OF SOCIAL SCIENCES, FINANCE, MANAGEMENT, BUSINESS DEVELOPMENT, MARKETING AND COMMUNICATION 2 THE ADVANCEMENT OF HUMAN RIGHTS (AS SET OUT IN THE UNIVERSAL DECLARATION OF HUMAN RIGHTS AND SUBSEQUENT UNITED NATIONS CONVENTIONS AND DECLARATIONS), IN PARTICULAR THE HUMAN RIGHTS OF WOMEN, THROUGHOUT THE WORLD BY ALL OR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING MEANS A RELIEVING NEED AMONG THE VICTIMS OF HUMAN RIGHTS ABUSE B RESEARCH INTO HUMAN RIGHTS ISSUES C PROVIDING TECHNICAL ADVICE TO GOVERNMENT AND OTHERS ON HUMAN RIGHTS MATTERS D COMMENTING ON PROPOSED HUMAN RIGHTS LEGISLATION E RAISING AWARENESS OF HUMAN RIGHTS ISSUES F PROMOTING PUBLIC SUPPORT FOR HUMAN RIGHTS G PROMOTING RESPECT FOR HUMAN RIGHTS AMONG INDIVIDUALS AND CORPORATIONS; AND H INTERNATIONAL ADVOCACY OF HUMAN RIGHTS; AND 3 SUCH OTHER EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DECIDE
Area of benefit
WORLDWIDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
4-12 Queen Annes Gate
Flat 1-2
SW1H 9AA
- Phone:
- +447771812923
- Email:
- sagra.maceira@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window