1 2 3 SOLEIL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Teaching french to bilingual children based in UK
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 24 November 2009: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SOPHIE FLORENCE WARD | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Dr Joelle White | Trustee | 11 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ophelie BARBET | Trustee | 18 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Fabienne Martinez | Trustee | 14 December 2014 |
|
|
||||
YASMINA NORVAL | Trustee | 24 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
Francois-Xavier CADINOUCHE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £140.16k | £111.39k | £131.23k | £159.01k | £159.31k | |
|
Total expenditure | £112.41k | £125.29k | £130.49k | £139.03k | £153.75k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 19 July 2024 | 49 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 19 July 2024 | 49 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 23 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 23 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 24 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 24 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 19 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 19 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 03 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 03 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 13 JULY 2009
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ("THE OBJECTS") ARE TO ADVANCE EDUCATION BY SUCH MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY CONSIDER APPROPRIATE INCLUDING BY MEANS OF ESTABLISHING AND OPERATING ANY EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENT OR ESTABLISHMENTS IN MAIDENHEAD AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT AND TO FULFIL SUCH OTHER PURPOSES WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AND ARE CONNECTED WITH THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE CHARITY.
Area of benefit
MAIDENHEAD, THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD
Contact information
- Address:
-
16 Ashley Park
MAIDENHEAD
Berkshire
SL6 8EZ
- Phone:
- 01628472691
- Email:
- info@123soleil.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window