HAND IN HAND ETHIOPIA

Charity Number: 1133055
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The charity is involved in the provision of funds to provide food and education for orphans in Addis Ababa, Ethiopia.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £42,824
Total expenditure: £54,926

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Other Finance
Where the charity operates:
  • Ethiopia

Governance

Registration history:
  • 02 December 2009: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
SUZANNE GAMBLE Chair
None on record
KAYE LOCKEY Trustee
None on record
NAOMI KOTZE Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £63.25k £54.58k £53.89k £53.20k £42.82k
Total expenditure £56.24k £56.64k £59.96k £59.98k £54.93k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 11 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 11 December 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 13 February 2024 13 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 16 March 2024 45 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 27 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 27 August 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 15 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 15 November 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 23 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 23 November 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
40 KINGS ROAD
FLITWICK
BEDFORD
MK45 1EL
Phone:
01525715896