Trustees SOUTHWELL AND DISTRICT, NOTTINGHAMSHIRE U3A
Charity Number: 1132337

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARJORIE BRAMHILL | Chair | 01 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
Jean Hogg | Trustee | 01 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Miriam Tate | Trustee | 01 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Janette Clarke-Humphries | Trustee | 22 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Nadina Berrice Lincoln | Trustee | 20 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Annabel Kingsbury | Trustee | 23 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Vivienne Barnett | Trustee | 23 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Brian William Platts | Trustee | 01 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
JANE ZDANOWSKI | Trustee | 01 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
Ann Powers | Trustee | 01 August 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.