THE REDEEMED CHRISTIAN CHURCH OF GOD (ROCK OF REDEMPTION (APATA IRAPADA) CHADWELL HEATH)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objectives of the church are: The advancement of the Christian faith worldwide The relief of poverty
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- City Of London
- Essex
- Redbridge
- Nigeria
Governance
- 28 October 2009: Standard registration
- THE REDEEMED CHRISTIAN CHURCH OF GOD (ROCK OF REDEMPTION (APATA IRAPADA) CHADWELL HEATH) LIMITED (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Adejoke Olubodun-Niyi | Trustee | 28 July 2024 |
|
|||||
Atinuke Ekundayo-Kehinde | Trustee | 28 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mutiat Kuku | Trustee | 28 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
OYEYEMI BABASANYA KUKU | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £66.98k | £70.69k | £67.67k | £70.82k | £95.62k | |
|
Total expenditure | £59.69k | £66.26k | £64.47k | £73.50k | £107.44k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.91k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 15 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | 15 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 04 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 04 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 07 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 07 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 30 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 30 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 26 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 26 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 02/09/2009 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 14/12/2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 17/03/2011
Charitable objects
1 THE ADVANCEMENT OF RELIGION - TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION IN UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY CONSIDER APPROPRIATE 2 ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION - TO ADVANCE EDUCATION WITH THE CHRISTIAN PRINCIPLES IN UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY CONSIDER APPROPRIATE 3 RELIEF OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS - TO RELIEVE PEOPLE WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS IN THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY CONSIDER APPROPRIATE
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD
Contact information
- Address:
-
168 High Road
ROMFORD
RM6 6LU
- Phone:
- 07904454339
- Email:
- yemikukzy@yahoo.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window