THE HIGH SHERIFF OF DYFED YOUNG PERSONS CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The making of financial awards to recognise youngsters who have been active in voluntary organisations in Dyfed
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Charitable Activities
- Carmarthenshire
- Ceredigion
- Pembrokeshire
Governance
- 29 December 2009: Standard registration
No other names
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Thomas Davies | Chair |
|
||||||
Helen Jones | Trustee | 01 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Meurig Raymond | Trustee | 01 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Professor Medwin Hughes CBE | Trustee | 19 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Rowland Rees-Evans | Trustee | 19 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
ROLAND ANTONY JAMES LEWIS | Trustee | 25 October 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.78k | £1.81k | £1.85k | £4.31k | £2.04k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £200 | £1.95k | £2.51k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 15 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 06 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 17 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 17 June 2022 | 109 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 06 April 2021 | 37 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 29 FEBRUARY 2009
Charitable objects
TO HELP YOUNG PEOPLE THROUGH LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES FOCUSSED ON PARTICIPATION IN THE VOLUNTARY COMMUNITY BASED ORGANISATIONS OPERATING IN DYFED LISTED BELOW SO AS TO DEVELOP THEIR CAPABILITIES THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY. ORGANISATIONS - SCOUTS, GUIDES, ARMY CADET FORCE, SEA CADET CORPS, AIR TRAINING CORPS, YOUNG FARMERS CLUBS, ST JOHN'S AMBULANCE CADETS, DYFED YOUNG FIRE FIGHTERS, THE PRINCES TRUST, DUKE OF EDINBURGH COUNTY UNITS, YOUNG CARERS.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Ungoed-Thomas & King Ltd
The Quay
CARMARTHEN
SA31 3LN
- Phone:
- 01267 239191
- Email:
- ROLAND.LEWIS@UTK.CO.UK
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window