UNIVIDA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
UNIVIDA's activities take place in one of the 550 slum communities of Fortaleza, in the north east of Brazil. On a daily basis the charity provides an extra 4 hours of education, a hot meal and a safe environment for 370 children to play and learn. Older students receive tuition and support to help them finish secondary school and find places at college or university.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Brazil
Governance
- 06 July 2010: Standard registration
- 16 February 2023: Funds received from 1055406 THE SANCTUARY CHARITABLE TRUST
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARTIN COLM SEAN CLEMENTS | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Marc Marques | Trustee | 10 July 2009 |
|
|
||||
JONATHAN HARRIS | Trustee |
|
||||||
RUTH KAREN MARQUES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £93.78k | £61.52k | £66.34k | £177.19k | £58.48k | |
|
Total expenditure | £108.76k | £50.42k | £58.62k | £110.37k | £63.03k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 21 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 21 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 25 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 23 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 23 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 19 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 19 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 21 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 21 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 10 JULY 2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE 28 MAY 2010
Charitable objects
3: TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN SUCH WAYS AND IN SUCH PARTS OF THE WORLD AS THE DIRECTORS, FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT. 3.2., TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OF THOSE IN NEED AND TO PROMOTE AND PRESERVE GOOD HEALTH BY THE PROVISION OF FUNDS, GOODS OR SERVICES OF ANY KIND INCLUDING THROUGH THE PROVISION OF COUNSELLING AND SUPPORT IN SUCH PARTS OF THE WORLD AS THE DIRECTORS FROM, TIME TO TIME THINK FIT. 3.3 TO ADVANCE IN LIFE AND RELIEVE THOSE IN NEED AND IN POVERTY THROUGH THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT ACTIVITIES AND RESOURCES WHICH DEVELOP THE SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES OF SUCH PEOPLE. 3.4 TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN SUCH WAYS AND IN SUCH PARTS OF WORLD AS THE DIRECTORS FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT; AND 3.5 TO PROMOTE SUCH OTHER PURPOSES THAT ARE DEEMED CHARITABLE IN SUCH PARTS OF THE WORLD AS THE DIRECTORS FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
THE WORLD
Contact information
- Address:
-
UNiViDA Office
7 High Street
Staple Hill
BRISTOL
BS16 5HA
- Phone:
- 01179568675
- Email:
- office@univida.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window