Financial history BUSY BEES PRE-SCHOOL (SOUTH OXHEY) LTD

Charity number: 1132737
Charity reporting is overdue by 915 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £92.04k £91.23k £116.21k £95.25k £72.41k
Total expenditure £99.87k £90.95k £98.14k £100.31k £80.16k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £79.12k £81.38k N/A N/A N/A