THE PAKISTAN EDUCATIONAL AND DEVELOPMENT ORGANISATION UK (PEDO UK)
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The trustees apply funds for the benefit of residents of the United Kingdom of Pakistani origin and for people in Pakistan, for i. The advancement of education for the public benefit; ii. The prevention and relief of poverty; iii. The preservation and protection of good health.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bedford
- Bradford City
- Luton
- Pakistan
Governance
- 17 August 2010: Standard registration
- 31 October 2023: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED MADE 12 JULY 2010
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF RESIDENTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OF PAKISTANI ORIGIN AND FOR PEOPLE IN PAKISTAN: 1 THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT 2 THE PREVENTION AND RELIEF OF POVERTY 3 THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF GOOD HEALTH
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM OF PAKISTANI ORIGIN AND FOR PEOPLE IN PAKISTAN
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window