FRIENDS OF FAIRFIELD SCHOOL (BATLEY)
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fund raising through various sponsored events for example: dragon boat race plus annual fund raising events such as the christmas fayre/raffle. Funded activities include pantomine, presents for the children, supplements to educational visits and additional non statutory items for school.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2013
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Calderdale
- Kirklees
- Leeds City
Governance
- 07 July 2010: Standard registration
- 28 March 2023: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- FRIENDS OF FAIRFIELD SCHOOL (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2011 | 31/05/2012 | 31/05/2013 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.91k | £8.20k | £7.13k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.21k | £13.81k | £4.61k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2019 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 13 OCTOBER 2009 AS AMENDED 8 JUNE 2010
Charitable objects
1. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS AT FAIRFIELD SCHOOL BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES THAT ARE NOT PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY, FOR EDUCATION AT THE SCHOOL. 2. TO ADVANCE IN LIFE AND HELP YOUNG PEOPLE THROUGH THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES PROVIDED IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE, DESIGNED TO IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS IN LIFE. 3. TO ADVANCE IN LIFE AND HELP YOUNG PEOPLE THROUGH PROVIDING SUPPORT AND ACTIVITIES WHICH DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY.
Area of benefit
FAIRFIELD SCHOOL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window