SHOEBURYNESS AND THORPE BAY BAPTIST CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The purpose and function of the Church is summed up in the Mission Statement which is "to fulfil God's purpose in our community and beyond."
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Southend-on-sea
Governance
- 05 November 2009: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Karen Elizabeth Peters | Chair | 20 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Yolande Joan Sayer | Trustee | 19 November 2024 |
|
|||||
Rev Alan John Brand | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Philip Burnham | Trustee | 21 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Joanna Catherine Hellenbrand | Trustee | 21 November 2023 |
|
|||||
Graham Bannister | Trustee | 02 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susan Ann Evans | Trustee | 21 July 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £353.93k | £273.13k | £311.15k | £328.21k | £329.81k | |
|
Total expenditure | £418.27k | £354.46k | £360.71k | £422.39k | £419.19k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £12.80k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 05 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 05 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 04 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 04 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 08 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 08 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 30 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 30 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 21 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 21 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 25 NOV 2008 AS AMENDED ON 25 MAR 2015
Charitable objects
THE PRINCIPAL PURPOSE OF THE CHURCH IS THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH ACCORDING TO THE PRINCIPLES OF THE BAPTIST DENOMINATION. THE CHURCH MAY ALSO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND CARRY OUT OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND/OR OTHER PARTS OF THE WORLD.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
SHOEBURYNESS & THORPE BAY BAPTIST
CHURCH
90 THORPEDENE GARDENS
SHOEBURYNESS
SOUTHEND-ON-SEA
SS3 9JD
- Phone:
- 01702 292620
- Email:
- office@stbbc.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window